U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:03-cr-00021-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. Wright
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
May, 2022
  • May 16, 2022: [Order Regarding Motion for Sentence Reduction - FIRST STEP ACT]
February, 2019
  • February 27, 2019: [Amended Judgment/Revocation Judgment]
November, 2018
  • November 13, 2018: [Amended Judgment/Revocation Judgment]
  • November 13, 2018: [Judgment]
June, 2016
  • June 01, 2016: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
February, 2016
  • February 12, 2016: [Judgment/Motion to Vacate 2255]
  • February 12, 2016: [Order on Motion to Vacate (2255)]
  • February 12, 2016: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
August, 2015
  • August 14, 2015: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.