U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:15-cr-00025-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. LAW
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2019
  • July 19, 2019: [Report and Order Terminating Probation/Supervised Release]
July, 2016
  • July 07, 2016: [Judgment]
February, 2016
  • February 17, 2016: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • February 16, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
December, 2015
  • December 11, 2015: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
November, 2015
  • November 04, 2015: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
October, 2015
  • October 23, 2015: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
September, 2015
  • September 02, 2015: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
August, 2015
  • August 14, 2015: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • August 14, 2015: [Order of Detention]
  • August 14, 2015: [Order Appointing Counsel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.