U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:06-cr-00017-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. TOBBIE
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2020
  • September 02, 2020: [Order]
June, 2020
  • June 22, 2020: [Order on Motion to Supplement]
October, 2019
  • October 04, 2019: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages]
September, 2019
  • September 18, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
August, 2019
  • August 08, 2019: [First Step Act Order Appointing Counsel]
September, 2016
  • September 16, 2016: [Judgment/Motion to Vacate 2255]
  • September 16, 2016: [Order on Motion to Vacate (2255)]
  • September 16, 2016: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
August, 2016
  • August 25, 2016: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Document]
  • August 25, 2016: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
August, 2015
  • August 17, 2015: [Order on Motion to Reduce Sentence - USSC Amendment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.