U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:07-cr-00081-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. Bacon et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2021
  • July 07, 2021: [Amended Judgment/Revocation Judgment]
May, 2021
  • May 20, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • May 20, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel]
March, 2021
  • March 12, 2021: [Amended Judgment/Revocation Judgment]
  • March 11, 2021: [Amended Judgment/Revocation Judgment]
January, 2021
  • January 27, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
December, 2020
  • December 31, 2020: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
  • December 31, 2020: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • December 29, 2020: [Order Appointing Counsel]
December, 2018
  • December 20, 2018: [Amended Judgment/Revocation Judgment]
October, 2018
  • October 05, 2018: [Order on Petition for Action on Conditions of Pretrial Release]
April, 2018
  • April 04, 2018: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
March, 2018
  • March 30, 2018: [Order Appointing Counsel]
February, 2017
  • February 15, 2017: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • February 15, 2017: [Order on Motion to Vacate (2255)]
  • February 15, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • February 15, 2017: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Document]
  • February 15, 2017: [Order on Motion to Supplement]
November, 2016
  • November 18, 2016: [Order]
July, 2016
  • July 27, 2016: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • July 27, 2016: [Order]
August, 2015
  • August 17, 2015: [Order on Motion to Reduce Sentence - USSC Amendment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.