U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:15-cr-00027-2
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. HOLLOMAN et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2017
  • February 07, 2017: [Judgment]
December, 2016
  • December 13, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue]
November, 2016
  • November 17, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • November 07, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
March, 2016
  • March 28, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue]
February, 2016
  • February 19, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
January, 2016
  • January 13, 2016: [Order on Motion for Additional Decrease for Acceptance of Responsibility]
October, 2015
  • October 02, 2015: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
September, 2015
  • September 15, 2015: [Order]
  • September 02, 2015: [Order to Show Cause]
August, 2015
  • August 19, 2015: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • August 19, 2015: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • August 17, 2015: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.