U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:07-cr-00009-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. St. Rose
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 08, 2022: [Order on Motion to Reduce Sentence - FIRST STEP ACT]
October, 2020
  • October 19, 2020: [Order Regarding Motion for Sentence Reduction - FIRST STEP ACT]
April, 2020
  • April 17, 2020: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document]
December, 2019
  • December 19, 2019: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document]
November, 2019
  • November 26, 2019: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document]
September, 2019
  • September 09, 2019: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document]
  • September 09, 2019: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages]
July, 2019
  • July 25, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
June, 2019
  • June 14, 2019: [First Step Act Order Appointing Counsel]
August, 2016
  • August 03, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 03, 2016: [Order on Motion to Compel]
August, 2015
  • August 18, 2015: [Order on Motion to Reduce Sentence - USSC Amendment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.