U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:15-cr-00040-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. BARNETT et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2016
  • June 22, 2016: [Judgment]
May, 2016
  • May 20, 2016: [Judgment]
April, 2016
  • April 18, 2016: [Order on Motion for Revocation of Pretrial Release]
December, 2015
  • December 18, 2015: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
November, 2015
  • November 12, 2015: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
September, 2015
  • September 15, 2015: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • September 11, 2015: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • September 11, 2015: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • September 11, 2015: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • September 04, 2015: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • September 04, 2015: [Order of Detention]
  • September 01, 2015: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
August, 2015
  • August 19, 2015: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.