U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:15-cr-00045-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. BROADNAX
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 20, 2023: [Amended Judgment/Revocation Judgment]
  • January 20, 2023: [Order to Surrender]
August, 2022
  • August 12, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
July, 2022
  • July 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • July 18, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel]
April, 2016
  • April 21, 2016: [Judgment]
September, 2015
  • September 30, 2015: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • September 02, 2015: [Order of Detention]
  • September 02, 2015: [Standard Pretrial Order]
August, 2015
  • August 25, 2015: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • August 20, 2015: [Order Appointing Counsel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.