U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:15-cr-00038-2
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. JOHNSON et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2021
  • January 28, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel]
December, 2020
  • December 10, 2020: [Amended Judgment/Revocation Judgment]
November, 2020
  • November 30, 2020: [Order of Detention]
July, 2020
  • July 01, 2020: [Order of Detention]
June, 2020
  • June 25, 2020: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • June 25, 2020: [Order Regarding Motion for Sentence Reduction - FIRST STEP ACT]
  • June 09, 2020: [First Step Act Order Appointing Counsel]
August, 2018
  • August 30, 2018: [Amended Judgment/Revocation Judgment]
  • August 24, 2018: [Amended Judgment/Revocation Judgment]
July, 2018
  • July 19, 2018: [Order of Detention]
October, 2017
  • October 03, 2017: [Order]
September, 2017
  • September 06, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • September 06, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 06, 2017: [Order Appointing Counsel]
August, 2016
  • August 19, 2016: [Judgment]
  • August 15, 2016: [Order]
February, 2016
  • February 25, 2016: [Judgment]
January, 2016
  • January 20, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • January 14, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • January 13, 2016: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • January 13, 2016: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • January 13, 2016: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
November, 2015
  • November 24, 2015: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
October, 2015
  • October 22, 2015: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • October 20, 2015: [Order Appointing Counsel]
September, 2015
  • September 22, 2015: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • September 02, 2015: [Order on Motion for Detention]
August, 2015
  • August 25, 2015: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • August 21, 2015: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.