U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:15-cr-00025-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. BRANNAN
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2016
  • June 14, 2016: [Judgment]
  • June 13, 2016: [Order to Surrender]
May, 2016
  • May 10, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue]
March, 2016
  • March 07, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • March 01, 2016: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
November, 2015
  • November 10, 2015: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
October, 2015
  • October 14, 2015: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
August, 2015
  • August 28, 2015: [Order]
  • August 28, 2015: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • August 28, 2015: [Standard Pretrial Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.