U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:07-cr-00048-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. Glynn et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2021
  • September 17, 2021: [Order Regarding Motion for Sentence Reduction - FIRST STEP ACT]
February, 2021
  • February 24, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 22, 2021: [Order]
June, 2020
  • June 23, 2020: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • June 23, 2020: [Order on Motion for Compassionate Release]
September, 2018
  • September 26, 2018: [Order]
August, 2018
  • August 23, 2018: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
  • August 23, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
July, 2018
  • July 25, 2018: [Order]
June, 2018
  • June 25, 2018: [Order]
  • June 25, 2018: [Order on Motion Rule 60(b) Relief from Judgment or Order]
  • June 25, 2018: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
May, 2018
  • May 22, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • May 21, 2018: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
June, 2017
  • June 28, 2017: [Order]
October, 2015
  • October 29, 2015: [Order on Motion to Vacate (2255)]
  • October 29, 2015: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
September, 2015
  • September 01, 2015: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.