U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:10-cr-00004-1
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Miller
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2021
  • July 29, 2021: [Report and Order Terminating Probation/Supervised Release]
July, 2020
  • July 21, 2020: [Order on Motion to Vacate (2255)]
  • July 21, 2020: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
June, 2020
  • June 22, 2020: [Order for Response to 2255 Motion]
  • June 12, 2020: [Order]
October, 2017
  • October 23, 2017: [Judgment/Motion to Vacate 2255]
  • October 23, 2017: [Order on Motion to Vacate (2255)]
  • October 23, 2017: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
April, 2017
  • April 03, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
December, 2016
  • December 09, 2016: [Order on Motion to Stay]
October, 2016
  • October 27, 2016: [Order on Motion to Stay]
July, 2016
  • July 15, 2016: [Order]
June, 2016
  • June 28, 2016: [Order for Response to 2255 Motion]
  • June 15, 2016: [Order Appointing Counsel]
October, 2015
  • October 22, 2015: [Amended Judgment]
  • October 05, 2015: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
September, 2015
  • September 02, 2015: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • September 02, 2015: [Order of Detention]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.