U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:15-mj-00106-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. PERERA-ZULUETA
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
May, 2016
  • May 05, 2016: [Judgment]
April, 2016
  • April 28, 2016: [Interpreter Appointed]
March, 2016
  • March 24, 2016: [Order on Motion to Appoint Expert]
December, 2015
  • December 02, 2015: [Set/Reset Hearings]
October, 2015
  • October 23, 2015: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • October 22, 2015: [Set/Reset Hearings]
September, 2015
  • September 24, 2015: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 10, 2015: [Set/Reset Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.