U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:07-cr-00015-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. CLEMONS
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2017
  • January 31, 2017: [Judgment/Motion to Vacate 2255]
  • January 31, 2017: [Order on Motion to Vacate (2255)]
  • January 31, 2017: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
May, 2016
  • May 26, 2016: [Amended Judgment/Revocation Judgment]
April, 2016
  • April 19, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 05, 2016: [Order on Motion for Revocation of Pretrial Release]
  • April 05, 2016: [Order Appointing Counsel]
December, 2015
  • December 10, 2015: [Order]
October, 2015
  • October 07, 2015: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
September, 2015
  • September 30, 2015: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.