U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:15-cr-00040-4
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. WRIGHT et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 28, 2022: [Report and Order Terminating Probation/Supervised Release]
February, 2022
  • February 04, 2022: [Report and Order Terminating Probation/Supervised Release]
December, 2021
  • December 15, 2021: [Report and Order Terminating Probation/Supervised Release]
August, 2021
  • August 11, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
January, 2021
  • January 19, 2021: [Repayment Agreement and Order]
  • January 04, 2021: [Order]
December, 2020
  • December 10, 2020: [Order Modifying Conditions of Pretrial Release]
  • December 09, 2020: [Order]
  • December 03, 2020: [Order of Commitment]
October, 2020
  • October 19, 2020: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • October 19, 2020: [Order Appointing Counsel]
July, 2020
  • July 01, 2020: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
June, 2020
  • June 30, 2020: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • June 19, 2020: [Order]
January, 2020
  • January 21, 2020: [Repayment Agreement and Order]
July, 2019
  • July 19, 2019: [Order Appointing Counsel]
November, 2018
  • November 29, 2018: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • November 27, 2018: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
September, 2018
  • September 21, 2018: [Judgment]
  • September 17, 2018: [Judgment]
May, 2018
  • May 29, 2018: [Order]
April, 2018
  • April 18, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
March, 2018
  • March 30, 2018: [Order]
February, 2018
  • February 08, 2018: [Order]
January, 2018
  • January 09, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • January 04, 2018: [Order]
December, 2017
  • December 18, 2017: [Order for Return of Registry Funds]
  • December 14, 2017: [Order]
  • December 06, 2017: [Judgment]
  • December 05, 2017: [Judgment]
November, 2017
  • November 30, 2017: [Petition and Order Re Restitution Agreement]
  • November 27, 2017: [Order for Return of Registry Funds]
  • November 14, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss/Want of Prosecution]
  • November 07, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
October, 2017
  • October 23, 2017: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • October 19, 2017: [Judgment]
September, 2017
  • September 27, 2017: [Judgment]
August, 2017
  • August 02, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
June, 2017
  • June 21, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • June 21, 2017: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • June 21, 2017: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • June 14, 2017: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • June 12, 2017: [Order]
  • June 05, 2017: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
May, 2017
  • May 30, 2017: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • May 24, 2017: [Order]
  • May 16, 2017: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • May 16, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • May 16, 2017: [Order Appointing Counsel]
April, 2017
  • April 06, 2017: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
March, 2017
  • March 30, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • March 28, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • March 08, 2017: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • March 07, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • March 03, 2017: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • March 01, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
February, 2017
  • February 28, 2017: [Order Modifying Conditions of Pretrial Release]
  • February 27, 2017: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • February 27, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • February 22, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • February 16, 2017: [Order]
  • February 14, 2017: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • February 13, 2017: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • February 13, 2017: [Order for Return of Registry Funds]
  • February 07, 2017: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • February 07, 2017: [Order]
  • February 06, 2017: [Order]
January, 2017
  • January 30, 2017: [Order Appointing Counsel]
December, 2016
  • December 30, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • December 22, 2016: [Judgment]
  • December 14, 2016: [Order]
  • December 14, 2016: [Order to Surrender]
October, 2016
  • October 25, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
September, 2016
  • September 29, 2016: [Order]
  • September 26, 2016: [Judgment]
  • September 02, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
July, 2016
  • July 25, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue]
June, 2016
  • June 14, 2016: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
May, 2016
  • May 31, 2016: [Order on Motion for Psychiatric Exam]
April, 2016
  • April 07, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
February, 2016
  • February 25, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • February 25, 2016: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • February 25, 2016: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • February 25, 2016: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • February 16, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • February 09, 2016: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • February 05, 2016: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • February 04, 2016: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
January, 2016
  • January 04, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss/Want of Prosecution]
November, 2015
  • November 16, 2015: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • November 16, 2015: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • November 04, 2015: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
October, 2015
  • October 29, 2015: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • October 19, 2015: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • October 19, 2015: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • October 01, 2015: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • October 01, 2015: [Standard Pretrial Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.