U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:05-cr-00086-3
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. JORDAN et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2019
  • January 22, 2019: [Order]
October, 2018
  • October 25, 2018: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • October 25, 2018: [Order Appointing Counsel]
April, 2017
  • April 11, 2017: [Order]
August, 2016
  • August 24, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • August 23, 2016: [Order]
  • August 18, 2016: [Order Appointing Counsel]
November, 2015
  • November 20, 2015: [Amended Judgment]
October, 2015
  • October 13, 2015: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • October 09, 2015: [Order of Detention]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.