U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:15-cr-00037-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. SHAH
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2021
  • April 01, 2021: [Report and Order Terminating Probation/Supervised Release]
July, 2017
  • July 06, 2017: [Order]
June, 2017
  • June 14, 2017: [Order to Show Cause]
March, 2017
  • March 09, 2017: [Sealed Order]
  • March 09, 2017: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
December, 2016
  • December 08, 2016: [Sealed Order]
September, 2016
  • September 09, 2016: [Sealed Order]
May, 2016
  • May 27, 2016: [Sealed Order]
  • May 27, 2016: [Order to Extend Designation Date]
March, 2016
  • March 07, 2016: [Sealed Order]
  • March 07, 2016: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
February, 2016
  • February 04, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
January, 2016
  • January 28, 2016: [Judgment]
  • January 28, 2016: [Order]
  • January 26, 2016: [Order to Surrender]
December, 2015
  • December 23, 2015: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
October, 2015
  • October 14, 2015: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.