U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:01-cr-00002-3
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. Willingham et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2019
  • July 26, 2019: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages]
May, 2019
  • May 30, 2019: [First Step Act Order Appointing Counsel]
December, 2015
  • December 21, 2015: [Report and Order Terminating Probation/Supervised Release]
November, 2015
  • November 04, 2015: [Amended Judgment to Reduce Sentence - USSC Amendment]
  • November 04, 2015: [Order on Sentence Reduction - USSC Amendment]
  • November 02, 2015: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
October, 2015
  • October 21, 2015: [Report and Order Terminating Probation/Supervised Release]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.