U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:15-cr-00054-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. KERNODLE et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2017
  • April 17, 2017: [Judgment]
  • April 11, 2017: [Order to Surrender]
February, 2017
  • February 13, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue]
August, 2016
  • August 30, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • August 19, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
July, 2016
  • July 22, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
January, 2016
  • January 14, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
November, 2015
  • November 23, 2015: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
October, 2015
  • October 29, 2015: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • October 29, 2015: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • October 29, 2015: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.