U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:02-cr-00023-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. Harris
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2021
  • October 27, 2021: [Judgment]
  • October 25, 2021: [Order to Surrender]
  • October 14, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
March, 2021
  • March 19, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
February, 2021
  • February 11, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
January, 2021
  • January 20, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
December, 2020
  • December 14, 2020: [Order]
October, 2020
  • October 09, 2020: [Order]
  • October 02, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
August, 2020
  • August 21, 2020: [Order]
July, 2020
  • July 02, 2020: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • July 02, 2020: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • July 02, 2020: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • July 01, 2020: [Order]
November, 2015
  • November 03, 2015: [Order on Sentence Reduction - USSC Amendment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.