U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:15-cr-00049-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. CRAWFORD
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2016
  • July 29, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss/Want of Prosecution]
January, 2016
  • January 14, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
November, 2015
  • November 20, 2015: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • November 19, 2015: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • November 17, 2015: [Order of Detention]
  • November 09, 2015: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • November 09, 2015: [Order Appointing Counsel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.