U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:12-cr-00002-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. JORDAN
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2019
  • September 06, 2019: [Judgment]
May, 2019
  • May 28, 2019: [Order]
April, 2019
  • April 12, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • April 05, 2019: [Order]
March, 2019
  • March 01, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
February, 2019
  • February 25, 2019: [Order]
  • February 25, 2019: [Standard Pretrial Order]
January, 2019
  • January 11, 2019: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
November, 2015
  • November 13, 2015: [Report and Order Terminating Probation/Supervised Release]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.