U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:12-cr-00015-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. LOWE
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2016
  • December 07, 2016: [Judgment/Motion to Vacate 2255]
  • December 07, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • December 07, 2016: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
November, 2016
  • November 04, 2016: [Order]
July, 2016
  • July 28, 2016: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • July 28, 2016: [Order]
November, 2015
  • November 20, 2015: [Judgment/Motion to Vacate 2255]
  • November 20, 2015: [Order on Motion to Vacate (2255)]
  • November 20, 2015: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
  • November 16, 2015: [Order on Motion to Reduce Sentence - USSC Amendment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.