U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:15-cr-00019-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. BRIGHT et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2020
  • September 24, 2020: [Amended Judgment/Revocation Judgment]
August, 2020
  • August 24, 2020: [Amended Judgment/Revocation Judgment]
  • August 04, 2020: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
March, 2020
  • March 09, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • March 09, 2020: [Order Appointing Counsel]
September, 2016
  • September 15, 2016: [Judgment]
  • September 01, 2016: [Order on Motion to Strike]
June, 2016
  • June 30, 2016: [Judgment]
April, 2016
  • April 19, 2016: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
January, 2016
  • January 07, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
November, 2015
  • November 24, 2015: [Order of Detention]
  • November 24, 2015: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • November 20, 2015: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • November 20, 2015: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • November 17, 2015: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.