U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:15-cr-00061-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. MOSS et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 23, 2022: [Amended Judgment/Revocation Judgment]
April, 2022
  • April 25, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • April 22, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel]
January, 2017
  • January 04, 2017: [Order for Return of Registry Funds]
November, 2016
  • November 02, 2016: [Judgment]
October, 2016
  • October 26, 2016: [Order to Surrender]
September, 2016
  • September 27, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue]
July, 2016
  • July 01, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue]
May, 2016
  • May 10, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
April, 2016
  • April 01, 2016: [Order]
March, 2016
  • March 15, 2016: [Order on Motion for Revocation of Pretrial Release]
  • March 01, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
February, 2016
  • February 29, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
January, 2016
  • January 07, 2016: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
December, 2015
  • December 21, 2015: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • December 18, 2015: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • December 17, 2015: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • December 17, 2015: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • December 11, 2015: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • December 11, 2015: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • December 11, 2015: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • December 10, 2015: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • December 09, 2015: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • December 09, 2015: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • December 09, 2015: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • December 03, 2015: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • December 03, 2015: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • December 01, 2015: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • December 01, 2015: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.