U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:15-cr-00020-4
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. BAKER et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2019
  • January 03, 2019: [Report and Order Terminating Probation/Supervised Release]
September, 2018
  • September 12, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
May, 2018
  • May 17, 2018: [Amended Judgment/Revocation Judgment]
March, 2018
  • March 26, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • March 26, 2018: [Order Appointing Counsel]
December, 2017
  • December 08, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
January, 2017
  • January 10, 2017: [Judgment]
August, 2016
  • August 04, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • August 04, 2016: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • August 04, 2016: [Order Appointing Counsel]
July, 2016
  • July 28, 2016: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • July 21, 2016: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
June, 2016
  • June 30, 2016: [Judgment]
  • June 27, 2016: [Order for Return of Registry Funds]
February, 2016
  • February 02, 2016: [Protective Order]
January, 2016
  • January 05, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
December, 2015
  • December 03, 2015: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • December 02, 2015: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • December 02, 2015: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.