U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:15-cr-00022-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. ROLLE
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2020
  • April 10, 2020: [Judgment/Motion to Vacate 2255]
  • April 10, 2020: [Order on Motion to Vacate (2255)]
  • April 10, 2020: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
October, 2019
  • October 30, 2019: [Report and Order Terminating Probation/Supervised Release]
July, 2019
  • July 30, 2019: [Order on Motion to Supplement]
June, 2019
  • June 18, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
May, 2019
  • May 08, 2019: [Order for Response to 2255 Motion]
February, 2019
  • February 14, 2019: [Order on Motion for Return of Property/PostTrial]
April, 2018
  • April 13, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss/Want of Prosecution]
May, 2017
  • May 18, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 18, 2017: [Order on Motion for Return of Property/PostTrial]
January, 2017
  • January 11, 2017: [Judgment]
  • January 06, 2017: [Order for Return of Registry Funds]
October, 2016
  • October 03, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
September, 2016
  • September 15, 2016: [Judgment]
June, 2016
  • June 02, 2016: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • June 02, 2016: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • June 02, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
January, 2016
  • January 11, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
December, 2015
  • December 04, 2015: [Order of Detention]
  • December 03, 2015: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • December 02, 2015: [Order of Detention]
  • December 02, 2015: [Order Appointing Counsel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.