U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:15-cr-00057-2
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. SIMMONS et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 07, 2022: [Repayment Agreement and Order]
August, 2021
  • August 31, 2021: [Report and Order Terminating Probation/Supervised Release]
September, 2020
  • September 23, 2020: [Repayment Agreement and Order]
April, 2020
  • April 28, 2020: [Repayment Agreement and Order]
February, 2018
  • February 12, 2018: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
June, 2016
  • June 30, 2016: [Judgment]
  • June 27, 2016: [Order to Surrender]
  • June 22, 2016: [Order to Surrender]
  • June 21, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
December, 2015
  • December 22, 2015: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • December 03, 2015: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • December 02, 2015: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.