U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:15-cr-00023-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. PARRO et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2017
  • March 22, 2017: [Judgment]
June, 2016
  • June 24, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • June 24, 2016: [Standard Pretrial Order]
January, 2016
  • January 11, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
December, 2015
  • December 03, 2015: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • December 02, 2015: [Order of Detention]
  • December 02, 2015: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.