U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:15-mj-00144-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. GEORGE
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
May, 2017
  • May 30, 2017: [Order on Motion to Modify]
September, 2016
  • September 19, 2016: [Judgment]
January, 2016
  • January 21, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
December, 2015
  • December 04, 2015: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • December 04, 2015: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • December 03, 2015: [Set/Reset Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.