U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:15-cr-00021-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. PACHECO
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
September, 2020
  • September 17, 2020: [Judgment/Motion to Vacate 2255]
  • September 17, 2020: [Order on Motion to Vacate (2255)]
  • September 17, 2020: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
  • September 17, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
April, 2020
  • April 26, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Objection]
  • April 08, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Objection]
June, 2019
  • June 07, 2019: [Order]
  • June 06, 2019: [Order to Show Cause]
February, 2019
  • February 01, 2019: [Order for Response to 2255 Motion]
December, 2017
  • December 20, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
October, 2016
  • October 27, 2016: [Order]
  • October 21, 2016: [Judgment]
  • October 20, 2016: [Order]
January, 2016
  • January 29, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • January 06, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • January 06, 2016: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • January 05, 2016: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
December, 2015
  • December 07, 2015: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.