U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:15-cr-00029-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. Bynes
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • January 31, 2022: [Order on Motion for Compassionate Release]
December, 2020
  • December 31, 2020: [Order on Motion for Compassionate Release]
April, 2020
  • April 16, 2020: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
January, 2020
  • January 17, 2020: [Judgment/Motion to Vacate 2255]
  • January 17, 2020: [Order on Motion for Hearing]
  • January 17, 2020: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
  • January 17, 2020: [Order on Motion to Vacate (2255)]
  • January 17, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 17, 2020: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
July, 2019
  • July 22, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
April, 2019
  • April 17, 2019: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody]
October, 2018
  • October 22, 2018: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document]
April, 2018
  • April 24, 2018: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • April 24, 2018: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document]
March, 2018
  • March 05, 2018: [Order]
February, 2018
  • February 13, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
December, 2017
  • December 01, 2017: [Order for Response to 2255 Motion]
September, 2016
  • September 21, 2016: [Judgment]
June, 2016
  • June 24, 2016: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad testificandum]
  • June 15, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 03, 2016: [Order]
April, 2016
  • April 20, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • April 14, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • April 07, 2016: [Order]
March, 2016
  • March 15, 2016: [Order]
February, 2016
  • February 08, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
December, 2015
  • December 18, 2015: [Order of Detention]
  • December 16, 2015: [Order of Detention]
  • December 16, 2015: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • December 14, 2015: [Order of Detention]
  • December 14, 2015: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.