U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:15-cr-00030-2
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. PARKER et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2020
  • November 19, 2020: [Amended Judgment/Revocation Judgment]
  • November 18, 2020: [Amended Judgment/Revocation Judgment]
  • November 18, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
June, 2020
  • June 22, 2020: [Order on Motion for Compassionate Release]
May, 2019
  • May 31, 2019: [Judgment/Motion to Vacate 2255]
  • May 31, 2019: [Order on Motion to Vacate (2255)]
  • May 31, 2019: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
September, 2018
  • September 10, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
June, 2018
  • June 15, 2018: [Order for Response to 2255 Motion]
December, 2017
  • December 18, 2017: [Judgment]
July, 2017
  • July 19, 2017: [Sealed Order]
June, 2017
  • June 27, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue]
May, 2017
  • May 12, 2017: [Order]
  • May 11, 2017: [Order on Motion in Limine]
April, 2017
  • April 24, 2017: [Order]
  • April 20, 2017: [Sealed Order]
February, 2017
  • February 08, 2017: [Order]
October, 2016
  • October 26, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • October 21, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
September, 2016
  • September 20, 2016: [Order]
  • September 13, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
July, 2016
  • July 27, 2016: [Order]
June, 2016
  • June 30, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • June 28, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • June 06, 2016: [Order]
May, 2016
  • May 04, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
March, 2016
  • March 23, 2016: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • March 16, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • March 15, 2016: [Order]
  • March 10, 2016: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • March 09, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
February, 2016
  • February 25, 2016: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
December, 2015
  • December 29, 2015: [Order]
  • December 18, 2015: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • December 16, 2015: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • December 16, 2015: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.