U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:05-cr-00043-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. Miller
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 24, 2022: [Order on Motion to Supplement]
August, 2021
  • August 05, 2021: [Judgment]
  • August 05, 2021: [Order to Surrender]
April, 2021
  • April 02, 2021: [Order]
March, 2021
  • March 19, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
February, 2021
  • February 18, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • February 18, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • February 18, 2021: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
  • February 18, 2021: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • February 18, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • February 16, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
October, 2020
  • October 15, 2020: [COVID-19 Public Health and Safety Standing Order]
April, 2020
  • April 27, 2020: [Order Regarding Motion for Sentence Reduction - FIRST STEP ACT]
March, 2019
  • March 21, 2019: [Order]
February, 2019
  • February 01, 2019: [Order Regarding Motion for Sentence Reduction - FIRST STEP ACT]
April, 2016
  • April 04, 2016: [Order on Motion to Reduce Sentence - USSC Amendment]
December, 2015
  • December 23, 2015: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.