U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:15-cr-00050-2
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. DENNIS et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2016
  • December 13, 2016: [Judgment]
November, 2016
  • November 30, 2016: [Order for Return of Registry Funds]
  • November 02, 2016: [Judgment]
July, 2016
  • July 21, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss/Want of Prosecution]
June, 2016
  • June 22, 2016: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • June 21, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • June 21, 2016: [Order Appointing Counsel]
April, 2016
  • April 06, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
February, 2016
  • February 16, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • February 16, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • February 16, 2016: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • February 11, 2016: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • February 11, 2016: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • February 10, 2016: [Order of Detention]
January, 2016
  • January 26, 2016: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • January 07, 2016: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • January 07, 2016: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • January 06, 2016: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • January 06, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • January 06, 2016: [Order Appointing Counsel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.