U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:15-cr-00060-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. MOSS
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2017
  • February 23, 2017: [Order for Return of Registry Funds]
January, 2017
  • January 13, 2017: [Judgment]
November, 2016
  • November 01, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
July, 2016
  • July 20, 2016: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
May, 2016
  • May 25, 2016: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
February, 2016
  • February 29, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
January, 2016
  • January 06, 2016: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • January 06, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • January 06, 2016: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.