U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:03-cr-00030-1
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Winchester
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2016
  • September 06, 2016: [Judgment/Motion to Vacate 2255]
  • September 06, 2016: [Order on Motion to Vacate (2255)]
  • September 06, 2016: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
June, 2016
  • June 30, 2016: [Order to Show Cause]
  • June 24, 2016: [Order Appointing Counsel]
May, 2016
  • May 17, 2016: [Amended Judgment/Revocation Judgment]
  • May 17, 2016: [Order]
April, 2016
  • April 28, 2016: [Order of Detention]
March, 2016
  • March 17, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue]
January, 2016
  • January 27, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • January 27, 2016: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.