U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:06-cr-00028-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Jackson et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Judgment]
February, 2022
  • February 04, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • February 01, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 01, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
December, 2021
  • December 21, 2021: [Order]
November, 2021
  • November 01, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
September, 2021
  • September 29, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • September 29, 2021: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
  • September 28, 2021: [Order]
  • September 28, 2021: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • September 27, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • September 27, 2021: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
  • September 27, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel]
March, 2016
  • March 21, 2016: [Amended Judgment/Revocation Judgment]
  • March 15, 2016: [Order]
February, 2016
  • February 04, 2016: [Order]
January, 2016
  • January 29, 2016: [Order Appointing Counsel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.