U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:16-cr-00001-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. KIRK
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2018
  • February 12, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
May, 2017
  • May 18, 2017: [Order on Motion to Surrender]
April, 2017
  • April 17, 2017: [Judgment]
  • April 07, 2017: [Order to Surrender]
July, 2016
  • July 13, 2016: [Sealed Order]
June, 2016
  • June 07, 2016: [Sealed Order]
  • June 06, 2016: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document]
March, 2016
  • March 02, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
February, 2016
  • February 11, 2016: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • February 10, 2016: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • February 02, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • February 02, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 01, 2016: [Order Appointing Counsel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.