U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:15-mc-00005
  • Case Name: BLACH v. DIAZ-VERSON
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
October, 2019
  • October 21, 2019: [Judgment]
  • October 17, 2019: [Order on Motion for Disbursement of Funds]
August, 2019
  • August 20, 2019: [Order on Motion for Disbursement of Funds]
July, 2019
  • July 10, 2019: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
June, 2019
  • June 18, 2019: [Judgment]
May, 2019
  • May 29, 2019: [Writ of Garnishment]
  • May 21, 2019: [Order on Motion for Disbursement of Funds]
April, 2019
  • April 18, 2019: [Writ of Garnishment]
March, 2019
  • March 18, 2019: [Writ of Garnishment]
  • March 08, 2019: [Judgment]
  • March 07, 2019: [Order on Motion for Disbursement of Funds]
February, 2019
  • February 13, 2019: [Writ of Garnishment]
January, 2019
  • January 25, 2019: [Judgment]
  • January 25, 2019: [Order on Motion for Disbursement of Funds]
  • January 25, 2019: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • January 16, 2019: [Writ of Garnishment]
  • January 11, 2019: [Judgment]
  • January 11, 2019: [Order on Motion for Disbursement of Funds]
  • January 11, 2019: [Order on Motion for Hearing]
December, 2018
  • December 19, 2018: [Writ of Garnishment]
November, 2018
  • November 20, 2018: [Writ of Garnishment]
  • November 05, 2018: [Judgment]
  • November 02, 2018: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • November 02, 2018: [Order on Motion for Disbursement of Funds]
October, 2018
  • October 24, 2018: [Writ of Garnishment]
September, 2018
  • September 26, 2018: [Writ of Garnishment]
August, 2018
  • August 29, 2018: [Writ of Garnishment]
  • August 03, 2018: [Writ of Garnishment]
July, 2018
  • July 10, 2018: [Judgment]
  • July 09, 2018: [Order on Motion for Disbursement of Funds]
June, 2018
  • June 06, 2018: [Writ of Garnishment]
May, 2018
  • May 29, 2018: [Judgment]
  • May 25, 2018: [Order on Motion for Disbursement of Funds]
  • May 25, 2018: [Order on Amended Motion]
  • May 14, 2018: [Writ of Garnishment]
April, 2018
  • April 30, 2018: [Judgment]
  • April 27, 2018: [Order on Motion for Disbursement of Funds]
  • April 12, 2018: [Writ of Garnishment]
  • April 06, 2018: [Judgment]
  • April 02, 2018: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • April 02, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
March, 2018
  • March 14, 2018: [Order on Motion for Disbursement of Funds]
  • March 14, 2018: [Writ of Garnishment]
February, 2018
  • February 14, 2018: [Writ of Garnishment]
  • February 09, 2018: [Order on Motion for Disbursement of Funds]
  • February 09, 2018: [Order on Amended Motion]
  • February 09, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
January, 2018
  • January 29, 2018: [Order on Motion for Hearing]
  • January 29, 2018: [Order on Motion for Sanctions]
  • January 29, 2018: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • January 29, 2018: [Order on Amended Motion]
  • January 29, 2018: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • January 29, 2018: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • January 29, 2018: [Order on Motion for Disbursement of Funds]
  • January 29, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • January 22, 2018: [Writ of Garnishment]
  • January 18, 2018: [Writ of Garnishment]
December, 2017
  • December 20, 2017: [Writ of Garnishment]
November, 2017
  • November 21, 2017: [Writ of Garnishment]
October, 2017
  • October 25, 2017: [Writ of Garnishment]
September, 2017
  • September 27, 2017: [Writ of Garnishment]
August, 2017
  • August 29, 2017: [Writ of Garnishment]
  • August 02, 2017: [Writ of Garnishment]
July, 2017
  • July 03, 2017: [Writ of Garnishment]
June, 2017
  • June 22, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • June 09, 2017: [Writ of Garnishment]
May, 2017
  • May 15, 2017: [Judgment]
  • May 12, 2017: [Order on Motion for Disbursement of Funds]
  • May 11, 2017: [Writ of Garnishment]
  • May 09, 2017: [Judgment]
  • May 08, 2017: [Order]
April, 2017
  • April 18, 2017: [Order]
  • April 12, 2017: [Writ of Garnishment]
March, 2017
  • March 15, 2017: [Writ of Garnishment]
February, 2017
  • February 16, 2017: [Writ of Garnishment]
January, 2017
  • January 18, 2017: [Writ of Garnishment]
November, 2016
  • November 10, 2016: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • November 10, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time (Misc)]
  • November 10, 2016: [Order on Motion to Unseal Document]
  • November 10, 2016: [Order on Motion to Compel]
October, 2016
  • October 27, 2016: [Writ of Garnishment]
September, 2016
  • September 30, 2016: [Order on Motion to Quash]
  • September 29, 2016: [Writ of Garnishment]
  • September 13, 2016: [Order]
August, 2016
  • August 31, 2016: [Writ of Garnishment]
  • August 30, 2016: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • August 19, 2016: [Scheduling/Discovery Order]
  • August 18, 2016: [Order to Show Cause]
  • August 03, 2016: [Writ of Garnishment]
July, 2016
  • July 22, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
June, 2016
  • June 20, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
April, 2016
  • April 01, 2016: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • April 01, 2016: [Order on Motion for Disbursement of Funds]
March, 2016
  • March 04, 2016: [Order]
February, 2016
  • February 18, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.