U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:16-cr-00007-2
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. MANN et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2021
  • May 20, 2021: [Judgment/Motion to Vacate 2255]
  • May 20, 2021: [Order on Amended Motion]
  • May 20, 2021: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
April, 2021
  • April 05, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
  • April 05, 2021: [Order]
January, 2021
  • January 08, 2021: [Order on Motion to Strike]
September, 2020
  • September 04, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Objection]
July, 2020
  • July 17, 2020: [Order on Motion for Compassionate Release]
June, 2020
  • June 11, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
April, 2020
  • April 23, 2020: [Order on Motion for Compassionate Release]
February, 2020
  • February 07, 2020: [Order]
January, 2020
  • January 29, 2020: [Order]
  • January 10, 2020: [Order for Response to 2255 Motion]
  • January 10, 2020: [Order]
August, 2019
  • August 28, 2019: [Report and Order Terminating Probation/Supervised Release]
April, 2018
  • April 10, 2018: [Order on Motion for Bond]
February, 2018
  • February 23, 2018: [Order]
July, 2017
  • July 26, 2017: [Judgment]
  • July 25, 2017: [Order to Surrender]
June, 2017
  • June 15, 2017: [Judgment]
  • June 02, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • June 02, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • June 02, 2017: [Order on Motion to File Additional Motions]
  • June 02, 2017: [Order]
April, 2017
  • April 03, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
March, 2017
  • March 27, 2017: [Order]
  • March 24, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • March 02, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
February, 2017
  • February 01, 2017: [Order]
December, 2016
  • December 15, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
October, 2016
  • October 25, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
August, 2016
  • August 23, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
June, 2016
  • June 08, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
April, 2016
  • April 08, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • April 07, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
March, 2016
  • March 10, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • March 09, 2016: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear]
February, 2016
  • February 29, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • February 29, 2016: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • February 29, 2016: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • February 25, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • February 22, 2016: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.