U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:16-cr-00002-5
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. BIGGS et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 26, 2022: [Order on Motion to Unseal Document]
August, 2022
  • August 09, 2022: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
July, 2022
  • July 06, 2022: [Order on Motion for New Trial]
April, 2022
  • April 19, 2022: [Report and Order Terminating Probation/Supervised Release]
November, 2021
  • November 19, 2021: [Order on Motion to Modify]
October, 2021
  • October 14, 2021: [Order on Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • October 14, 2021: [Order on Motion for New Trial]
  • October 14, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 07, 2021: [Judgment/Motion to Vacate 2255]
  • October 07, 2021: [Order on Motion to Vacate (2255)]
  • October 07, 2021: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
June, 2021
  • June 02, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • June 02, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
April, 2021
  • April 23, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Objection]
  • April 12, 2021: [Order]
March, 2021
  • March 31, 2021: [Order on Motion for Compassionate Release]
February, 2021
  • February 23, 2021: [Order on Motion for Compassionate Release]
  • February 23, 2021: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
November, 2020
  • November 05, 2020: [Order on Motion for Compassionate Release]
  • November 02, 2020: [Order on Motion for Compassionate Release]
August, 2020
  • August 12, 2020: [Order]
  • August 12, 2020: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • August 05, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Objection]
June, 2020
  • June 26, 2020: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • June 16, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 08, 2020: [Order for Response to 2255 Motion]
May, 2020
  • May 01, 2020: [Order on Motion for Compassionate Release]
April, 2020
  • April 27, 2020: [Order on Motion for Compassionate Release]
  • April 22, 2020: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages]
May, 2019
  • May 21, 2019: [Amended Judgment/Revocation Judgment]
  • May 20, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 20, 2019: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
April, 2019
  • April 15, 2019: [Judgment]
  • April 03, 2019: [Order to Surrender]
March, 2019
  • March 07, 2019: [Order]
January, 2019
  • January 17, 2019: [Order on Motion to Postpone]
  • January 15, 2019: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
December, 2018
  • December 18, 2018: [Judgment]
  • December 12, 2018: [Judgment]
  • December 11, 2018: [Order on Amended Motion]
  • December 11, 2018: [Order on Motion to Supplement]
  • December 10, 2018: [Order on Motion for Bond Forfeiture]
  • December 10, 2018: [Order]
  • December 07, 2018: [Order]
  • December 06, 2018: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
  • December 06, 2018: [Order to Surrender]
November, 2018
  • November 27, 2018: [Order on Motion for Expert Services]
  • November 13, 2018: [Order]
  • November 07, 2018: [Order]
August, 2018
  • August 29, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 08, 2018: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
July, 2018
  • July 16, 2018: [Order]
  • July 16, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • July 16, 2018: [Order for Return of Registry Funds]
  • July 03, 2018: [Order on Motion for Release of Funds]
  • July 03, 2018: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
May, 2018
  • May 23, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • May 22, 2018: [Order on Motion to Adopt]
  • May 22, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • May 22, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
August, 2017
  • August 29, 2017: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • August 29, 2017: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • August 03, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 01, 2017: [Order on Motion to Travel]
July, 2017
  • July 19, 2017: [Order]
  • July 12, 2017: [Order on Amended Motion]
  • July 12, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
November, 2016
  • November 15, 2016: [Protective Order]
  • November 07, 2016: [Order on Motion to Travel]
  • November 07, 2016: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • November 03, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
October, 2016
  • October 31, 2016: [Order on Joint Motion]
  • October 18, 2016: [Order]
  • October 18, 2016: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • October 06, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • October 06, 2016: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • October 06, 2016: [Order Appointing Counsel]
June, 2016
  • June 13, 2016: [Order on Joint Motion]
May, 2016
  • May 17, 2016: [Order on Motion to Travel]
  • May 13, 2016: [Protective Order]
April, 2016
  • April 25, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 25, 2016: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • April 25, 2016: [Order Appointing Counsel]
March, 2016
  • March 24, 2016: [Order on Motion to Adopt]
  • March 24, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • March 21, 2016: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • March 16, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • March 16, 2016: [Standard Pretrial Order]
February, 2016
  • February 26, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • February 23, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • February 23, 2016: [Standard Pretrial Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.