U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:16-cr-00011-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. DEASON
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2020
  • October 02, 2020: [Order on Motion for Compassionate Release]
June, 2017
  • June 05, 2017: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
May, 2017
  • May 18, 2017: [Order]
  • May 11, 2017: [Judgment]
  • May 04, 2017: [Order]
January, 2017
  • January 27, 2017: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
  • January 03, 2017: [Order for Return of Registry Funds]
December, 2016
  • December 05, 2016: [Order]
  • December 05, 2016: [Order on Motion in Limine]
November, 2016
  • November 09, 2016: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • November 07, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
October, 2016
  • October 26, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
September, 2016
  • September 06, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
June, 2016
  • June 08, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
April, 2016
  • April 11, 2016: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • April 07, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
March, 2016
  • March 14, 2016: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • March 14, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • March 11, 2016: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.