U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cr-00005-7
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. MILES et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2021
  • October 29, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 29, 2021: [Order on Motion for Certificate of Appealability]
  • October 29, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
  • October 22, 2021: [Report and Order Terminating Probation/Supervised Release]
July, 2021
  • July 29, 2021: [Order on Motion for Compassionate Release]
  • July 28, 2021: [Report and Order Terminating Probation/Supervised Release]
April, 2021
  • April 19, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 19, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
  • April 19, 2021: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
March, 2021
  • March 29, 2021: [Judgment/Motion to Vacate 2255]
  • March 29, 2021: [Order on Motion to Vacate (2255)]
  • March 29, 2021: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
February, 2021
  • February 25, 2021: [Order Regarding Motion for Sentence Reduction - FIRST STEP ACT]
December, 2020
  • December 31, 2020: [Order on Motion for Compassionate Release]
  • December 31, 2020: [Order Regarding Motion for Sentence Reduction - FIRST STEP ACT]
November, 2020
  • November 12, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Objection]
September, 2020
  • September 30, 2020: [Judgment/Motion to Vacate 2255]
  • September 29, 2020: [Order on Motion to Vacate (2255)]
  • September 29, 2020: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
May, 2020
  • May 27, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Objection]
March, 2020
  • March 24, 2020: [Order on Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • March 24, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
December, 2019
  • December 16, 2019: [Order for Response to 2255 Motion]
April, 2019
  • April 11, 2019: [Order for Response to 2255 Motion]
June, 2018
  • June 13, 2018: [Amended Judgment/Revocation Judgment]
May, 2018
  • May 21, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
March, 2018
  • March 02, 2018: [Judgment]
February, 2018
  • February 26, 2018: [Order]
  • February 23, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
November, 2017
  • November 17, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • November 08, 2017: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • November 01, 2017: [Judgment]
October, 2017
  • October 31, 2017: [Judgment]
  • October 11, 2017: [Judgment]
September, 2017
  • September 26, 2017: [Judgment]
  • September 19, 2017: [Judgment]
  • September 14, 2017: [Judgment]
  • September 01, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue]
August, 2017
  • August 31, 2017: [Order on Motion for New Trial]
  • August 28, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • August 28, 2017: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Plea of Guilty]
  • August 23, 2017: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • August 11, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue]
June, 2017
  • June 09, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue]
April, 2017
  • April 26, 2017: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 25, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue]
March, 2017
  • March 16, 2017: [Judgment]
  • March 06, 2017: [Order on Amended Motion]
February, 2017
  • February 24, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 23, 2017: [Order to Show Cause]
  • February 22, 2017: [Order to Surrender]
  • February 09, 2017: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
  • February 07, 2017: [Order on Motion for Review of Release/Detention Order i/c/w 18 USC 3145]
  • February 07, 2017: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • February 06, 2017: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad testificandum]
  • February 01, 2017: [Judgment]
January, 2017
  • January 18, 2017: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • January 18, 2017: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • January 12, 2017: [Order]
December, 2016
  • December 14, 2016: [Judgment]
  • December 02, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
September, 2016
  • September 29, 2016: [Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney]
  • September 22, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • September 21, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • September 09, 2016: [Sealed Order]
  • September 08, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • September 01, 2016: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
August, 2016
  • August 04, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
July, 2016
  • July 29, 2016: [Order on Motion for Recusal]
  • July 29, 2016: [Order on Amended Motion]
  • July 15, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 14, 2016: [Order]
  • July 11, 2016: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
May, 2016
  • May 13, 2016: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • May 12, 2016: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • May 11, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • May 11, 2016: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • May 11, 2016: [Order]
  • May 03, 2016: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
April, 2016
  • April 27, 2016: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 14, 2016: [Order]
  • April 13, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • April 12, 2016: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • April 12, 2016: [Standard Pretrial Order]
March, 2016
  • March 23, 2016: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • March 23, 2016: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • March 23, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • March 21, 2016: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • March 21, 2016: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • March 21, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • March 18, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • March 18, 2016: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • March 18, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • March 17, 2016: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • March 17, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • March 16, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • March 16, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • March 16, 2016: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • March 15, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • March 15, 2016: [Order Appointing Counsel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.