U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:16-cr-00016-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. BUTLER
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 07, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
April, 2021
  • April 30, 2021: [Order on Motion to Supplement]
  • April 30, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
January, 2021
  • January 05, 2021: [Order on Motion for Compassionate Release]
September, 2019
  • September 23, 2019: [Judgment/Motion to Vacate 2255]
  • September 23, 2019: [Order]
  • September 12, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
August, 2019
  • August 14, 2019: [Order]
March, 2019
  • March 20, 2019: [Order for Response to 2255 Motion]
March, 2017
  • March 31, 2017: [Amended Judgment/Revocation Judgment]
  • March 21, 2017: [Order]
  • March 17, 2017: [Judgment]
November, 2016
  • November 29, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue]
October, 2016
  • October 07, 2016: [Order for Return of Registry Funds]
  • October 07, 2016: [Order on Motion for Bond Forfeiture]
  • October 07, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
August, 2016
  • August 12, 2016: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • August 11, 2016: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
June, 2016
  • June 23, 2016: [Order on Motion for Revocation of Pretrial Release]
  • June 14, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
April, 2016
  • April 06, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
March, 2016
  • March 17, 2016: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • March 17, 2016: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 16, 2016: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • March 16, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • March 16, 2016: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • March 15, 2016: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.