U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:16-cr-00012-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. BRITT et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2020
  • May 06, 2020: [Order on Motion for Compassionate Release]
February, 2020
  • February 05, 2020: [Amended Judgment/Revocation Judgment]
January, 2020
  • January 13, 2020: [Order Appointing Counsel]
August, 2019
  • August 06, 2019: [Order Regarding Motion for Sentence Reduction - FIRST STEP ACT]
March, 2019
  • March 28, 2019: [Order]
  • March 05, 2019: [Order Regarding Motion for Sentence Reduction - FIRST STEP ACT]
February, 2017
  • February 27, 2017: [Judgment]
  • February 01, 2017: [Amended Judgment/Revocation Judgment]
January, 2017
  • January 26, 2017: [Judgment]
December, 2016
  • December 30, 2016: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
October, 2016
  • October 06, 2016: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • October 06, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 04, 2016: [Order]
September, 2016
  • September 27, 2016: [Order on Motion for Issuance of Subpoenas]
  • September 26, 2016: [Order on Motion for Expert Services]
May, 2016
  • May 25, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
April, 2016
  • April 28, 2016: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • April 28, 2016: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • April 28, 2016: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • April 04, 2016: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.