U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:16-mj-00026-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. EMIG
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
December, 2016
  • December 15, 2016: [Judgment]
November, 2016
  • November 21, 2016: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document]
June, 2016
  • June 24, 2016: [Order]
  • June 06, 2016: [Order]
  • June 03, 2016: [Order]
May, 2016
  • May 27, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 20, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
April, 2016
  • April 07, 2016: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • April 07, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.