U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:16-cr-00020-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. MARTIN
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2020
  • October 16, 2020: [Order on Motion for Compassionate Release]
June, 2017
  • June 20, 2017: [Order for Return of Registry Funds]
May, 2017
  • May 12, 2017: [Judgment]
April, 2017
  • April 19, 2017: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
December, 2016
  • December 14, 2016: [Order]
October, 2016
  • October 21, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
September, 2016
  • September 02, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
August, 2016
  • August 24, 2016: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • August 18, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
June, 2016
  • June 28, 2016: [Order of Detention]
May, 2016
  • May 25, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 25, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • May 25, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • May 23, 2016: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
April, 2016
  • April 15, 2016: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • April 15, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 12, 2016: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • April 11, 2016: [Order Appointing Counsel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.