U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:16-cr-00007-2
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. HODGE et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2020
  • May 27, 2020: [Order on Motion for Compassionate Release]
March, 2018
  • March 13, 2018: [Judgment]
  • March 07, 2018: [Order for Return of Registry Funds]
January, 2018
  • January 31, 2018: [Order on Motion for Revocation of Pretrial Release]
September, 2017
  • September 22, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
May, 2017
  • May 17, 2017: [Amended Judgment/Revocation Judgment]
  • May 15, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • May 09, 2017: [Judgment]
January, 2017
  • January 06, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
November, 2016
  • November 03, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
September, 2016
  • September 09, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
August, 2016
  • August 12, 2016: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • August 11, 2016: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • August 11, 2016: [Order Appointing Counsel]
July, 2016
  • July 27, 2016: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • July 13, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
May, 2016
  • May 10, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
April, 2016
  • April 28, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 27, 2016: [Standard Pretrial Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.