U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:16-cr-00015-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. NEWSOME et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2021
  • June 29, 2021: [Amended Judgment/Revocation Judgment]
March, 2021
  • March 09, 2021: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
  • March 09, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • March 09, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel]
December, 2017
  • December 01, 2017: [Order on Sentence Reduction - USSC Amendment]
February, 2017
  • February 15, 2017: [Judgment]
August, 2016
  • August 09, 2016: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • August 09, 2016: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
June, 2016
  • June 30, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • June 28, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • June 09, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
May, 2016
  • May 19, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • May 17, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • May 17, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • May 17, 2016: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • May 17, 2016: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • May 16, 2016: [Order Appointing Counsel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.